Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Zamburlini

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1832Born
30 Nov 185623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Mar 185724.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 189360.0AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
23 Apr 189360.3Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
22 Jun 189663.5AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
1 Dec 1909³76.9DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Zamburlini (VIAF: 253207693)
Archbishop Pietro Zamburlini (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnoli di Sopra, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopPadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 221, and Page 577
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,893, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast