Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Pisani

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to India

Titular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1871Born
15 Dec 191948.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia
15 Dec 191948.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to India
21 Dec 191948.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia
Oct 1924³53.2ResignedApostolic Delegate to India
16 Feb 196088.5DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Pisani
Archbishop Pietro Pisani (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of India

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVercelli, Italy

  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 73
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 139
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 517, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast