Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernhard Adriaan (Jordaan) Gijlswijk, O.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Southern Africa

Titular Archbishop of Euchaitae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1870BornDelft, Netherlands
15 Aug 189827.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Dec 192252.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Euchaitae
2 Dec 192252.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Africa
8 Dec 192252.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Euchaitae
22 Dec 194474.1DiedApostolic Delegate to Southern Africa

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Adriaan (Jordaan) Gijlswijk
Archbishop Bernhard Adriaan (Jordaan) Gijlswijk O.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Southern Africa

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016