Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Cuvelier, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Matadi

Titular Bishop of Circesium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1882BornHal, Belgium
8 Oct 190018.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Sep 190624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
28 Jun 192947.4AppointedPrefect of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Jul 193048.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Jul 193048.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Circesium
24 Aug 193048.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Circesium
May 1938³56.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Aug 196280.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Cuvelier:
Bishop Jean-François Cuvelier C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Matadi

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013