Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gjonali (Gionali)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sapë, Albania

Titular Bishop of Rhesaina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1875Born
10 Mar 190024.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 192146.3AppointedAbbot of Shën Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh), Albania
21 Nov 192146.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
15 Jan 192246.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
13 Jun 192853.1AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
30 Oct 193560.4ResignedBishop of Sapë, Albania
30 Oct 193560.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
20 Dec 195277.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sapë, Albania

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gjonali (Gionali)
Bishop Joseph Gjonali (Gionali) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sapë

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaçinari

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,270
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 3
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast