Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus (Frans) Joosten, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Datong [Tatung], China

Titular Bishop of Sagalassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1874Born
189419.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
9 Jul 189925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Jun 193258.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tatungfu, China
14 Jun 193258.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
28 Aug 193258.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
11 Apr 194672.0AppointedBishop of Datong [Tatung], China
20 Nov 194773.6ResignedBishop of Datong [Tatung], China
20 Nov 194773.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sagalassus
2 May 194874.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Datong [Tatung], China

MicroData Summary for Franciscus (Frans) Joosten
Bishop Franciscus (Frans) Joosten C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Datong [Tatung]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrubbenvorst, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands
Death PlaceNijmegen

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,949
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,932, Number 58
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 11 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast