Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Cecco, C.S.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Letopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1872Born
1896²23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Joseph
28 Apr 193158.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
28 Apr 193158.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Letopolis
24 May 193158.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Letopolis
1938²65.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
17 Feb 194471.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emilio Cecco
Bishop Emilio Cecco C.S.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinerolo, Italy

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast