Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nykanor Mykola Deyneha (Dejneha), M.S.U. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1907Born
16 Jun 193527.5ProfessedMember of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
15 Jul 193830.6Solemn VowsMember of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
1 Oct 193931.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
29 Oct 193931.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
Feb 1972³64.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
8 Nov 198274.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nykanor Mykola Deyneha (Dejneha)
Bishop Nykanor Mykola Deyneha (Dejneha) M.S.U. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSvystilnyky

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 4 Apr 2014
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 14,795
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • od/c01: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast