Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Josaphat Joseph Kocylovskyj (Kotsylovsky), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1876Born
9 Oct 190731.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 May 191337.2ProfessedPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
13 Jun 191640.2Solemn VowsPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
29 Jan 191740.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
23 Sep 191741.5Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
17 Nov 194771.7DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
27 Jun 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Josaphat Joseph Kocylovskyj (Kotsylovsky) (VIAF: 48575931)
Bishop Bl. Josaphat Joseph Kocylovskyj (Kotsylovsky) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

EventPlace
Birth PlacePakoshivka

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast