Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Konštantín Bohačevskyj

Deceased

Archbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1884Born
31 Jan 190924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 May 192439.9AppointedApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
20 May 192439.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
15 Jun 192439.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amisus
5 Apr 195469.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beroë
10 Jul 195874.0AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
6 Jan 196176.5DiedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Konštantín Bohačevskyj (VIAF: 289177938)
Archbishop Konštantín Bohačevskyj (born , died ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManajiv, Ukraine

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 37
  • opd/c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast