Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Vasyl Vsevolod Velychkovsky, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1903BornStanislaviv
29 Aug 192522.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
9 Oct 192522.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
195955.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
4 Feb 196359.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
30 Jun 197370.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Jun 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Vasyl Vsevolod Velychkovsky:
Bishop Bl. Vasyl Vsevolod Velychkovsky C.SS.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,257
  • ob/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014