Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Józef Weber, C. R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Archbishop of Darnis

Member of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1846Born
7 Jun 187326.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 189549.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
2 Dec 189549.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Temnus
29 Dec 189549.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temnus
15 Apr 190154.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lviv, Ukraine
15 Apr 190154.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Darnis
26 May 190659.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
24 Jun 190660.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
24 Mar 191871.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Józef Weber (VIAF: 303676235)
Archbishop Józef Weber C. R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFürstenthal, Archdiocese of Lviv
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Lviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • lvla/c2+: CB, 14 Feb 2008
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 240, and Page 540
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jul 2017