Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Volodymyr Malanczuk, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of France (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1904Born
21 Sep 192521.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Sep 192824.0Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
26 Apr 193126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Jul 196055.9AppointedApostolic Exarch of France (Ukrainian)
22 Jul 196055.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
19 Feb 196156.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
27 Nov 198278.2RetiredApostolic Exarch of France (Ukrainian)
29 Sep 199086.1DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of France (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Volodymyr Malanczuk (VIAF: 55120344)
Bishop Volodymyr Malanczuk C.SS.R. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of France

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBazar

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • c1: CB, 6 Feb 2015
  • sole: CB, 21 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Nov 2017