Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dmytro Yaremko

Deceased

Titular Bishop

Titular See: Ostroh/Ukrainian


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1879Born
21 Aug 190424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Sep 191434.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop
3 Oct 191636.9DiedTitular Bishop

MicroData Summary for Dmytro Yaremko
Bishop Dmytro Yaremko (born , died ) Titular Bishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHayok, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

  • a priest for 12.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,260
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 49
  • b: CB, 4 Oct 2016
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast