Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ivan Bucko

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Archbishop of Leucas

Titular See: (South America; Western Europe)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1891BornHermaniw, Ukraine
21 Feb 191523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Sep 192937.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Sep 192937.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cadi
20 Oct 192938.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cadi
17 Apr 194048.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
28 Jul 194553.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
27 Apr 195361.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leucas
27 Apr 195361.5AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
29 Nov 197180.1RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
21 Sep 197482.9DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Ivan Bucko:
Archbishop Ivan Bucko (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 78
  • opd: CB, 11 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 24 Jan 2015