Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Oleksandr Malynowskyj

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1889BornZhukiv, Ukraine
1925²35.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
5 Feb 194152.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland
1942¹52.9AppointedApostolic Exarch of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland
Sep 1945³56.6ResignedApostolic Exarch of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland
18 Nov 195768.8DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oleksandr Malynowskyj:
Father Oleksandr Malynowskyj (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Lemkowszczyzna

  • a priest for 32.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: CB, 5 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015