Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sviatoslav Shevchuk

Major Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Archbishop of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1970 BornStryj, Ukraine
21 May 199424.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Jun 199424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
14 Jan 200938.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
14 Jan 200938.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae
7 Apr 200938.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae
10 Apr 201039.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
23 Mar 201140.8SelectedMajor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
25 Mar 201140.8ConfirmedMajor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
25 Mar 201140.8AppointedArchbishop of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Mar 201140.8InstalledMajor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Sviatoslav Shevchuk:
Archbishop Sviatoslav Shevchuk (born ) Major Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015