Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bohdan John Danylo

Bishop of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1971 BornGiżycko, Poland
1 Oct 199625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA
7 Aug 201443.2AppointedBishop of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian), USA
4 Nov 201443.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian), USA

MicroData Summary for Bohdan John Danylo:
Bishop Bohdan John Danylo (born ) Bishop of Saint Josaphat in Parma

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Aug 2014
  • c1: CB, 7 Aug 2014
  • ob: CB, 2 Sep 2014
  • c2: CB, 22 Sep 2014
  • c34: CB, 26 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 27 Oct 2014