Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Petro Loza, C.Ss.R.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Panium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1979 Born
2003²23.5Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
26 Aug 200728.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Apr 201838.8ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 Apr 201838.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Panium
12 Jul 201839.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petro Loza
Father Petro Loza C.Ss.R. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Sokal-Zhovkva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKolodentsi, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Sokal, Eparchy of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Father through the Eparchy of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2018
  • by/bp: CB, 12 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Apr 2018
  • c34: CB, 18 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast