Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bohdan Manyshyn

Auxiliary Bishop of Stryj (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Lesvi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1972 BornNovyj Rozdil
3 Mar 200229.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Stryj (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Sep 200229.9Ordained PriestPriest of Stryj (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Apr 201441.4ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Stryj (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Apr 201441.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
24 May 201441.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesvi

MicroData Summary for Bohdan Manyshyn:
Bishop Bohdan Manyshyn (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Stryj

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Stryj (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2014
  • od/c01: CB, 2 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Apr 2014