Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mykola Bychok, C.Ss.R.

Bishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1980 Born
12 Jul 199717.4EnteredMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Aug 199818.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
17 Aug 200323.5Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Jul 200424.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
3 May 200525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Jan 202039.9AppointedBishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia
7 Jun 202040.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia

MicroData Summary for Mykola Bychok
Bishop Mykola Bychok C.Ss.R. (born ) Bishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTernopoli
Ordained PriestLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Ordained BishopSt. Yura, Cathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2020
  • prof/c01/od: CB, 15 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jan 2020
  • ob/c4: CB, 9 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 7 Jun 2020

Quantcast