Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugeniusz Mirosław Popowicz

Archbishop of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1961 BornCzłuchów
14 Oct 198625.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
17 Oct 198625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
4 Nov 201352.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian), Poland
4 Nov 201352.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
21 Dec 201352.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
7 Nov 201554.0AppointedArchbishop of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian), Poland
19 Dec 201554.1InstalledArchbishop of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Eugeniusz Mirosław Popowicz:
Archbishop Eugeniusz Mirosław Popowicz (born ) Archbishop of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013
  • c1: CB, 4 Nov 2013
  • ob/c02: CB, 6 Nov 2013
  • c34: CB, 18 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 164
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,996
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015