Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philemon Kurchaba, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Abrittum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1913BornRelykosilky
193117.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Jul 193723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Feb 198571.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199177.0ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199177.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Abrittum
26 Oct 199581.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Philemon Kurchaba:
Bishop Philemon Kurchaba C.SS.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,447
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015