Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dmytro (Bohdan) Hryhorak, O.S.B.M.

Bishop of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1956 Born
14 Oct 198933.7ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
21 Sep 199236.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
25 Oct 199236.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
2 Feb 199741.0Perpetual VowsPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
28 Jul 200751.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
23 Jul 201155.5ConfirmedBishop of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
18 Sep 201155.7Ordained BishopBishop of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Dmytro (Bohdan) Hryhorak
Bishop Dmytro (Bohdan) Hryhorak O.S.B.M. (born ) Bishop of Buchach {Bučač}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIvano-Frankivsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2011
  • c1: CB, 23 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Aug 2011
  • c4: CB, 15 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast