Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Pierre Pacareau] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Gironde (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1711Born
15 Mar 179179.4SelectedBishop of [Gironde (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179179.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Gironde (Constitutional), France]
5 Sep 179785.9DiedBishop of [Gironde (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Pierre Pacareau (VIAF: 66575104)
Bishop Pierre Pacareau (born , died ) Bishop of Gironde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bordeaux
Death PlaceBordeaux

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast