Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Augustin-Jean-Charles Clément] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1717Born
25 Feb 179779.4SelectedBishop of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]
12 Mar 179779.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³84.0ResignedBishop of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]
15 Mar 180486.5DiedBishop Emeritus of [Seine-et-Oise (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Jean-Charles Clément (VIAF: 104717840)
Bishop Augustin-Jean-Charles Clément (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Seine-et-Oise

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCréteil
Ordained BishopS. Louis, Versailles
Death PlaceLivry-Gargan, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast