Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Lacombe

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1749Born
1777¹27.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 179748.4SelectedBishop of [Gironde (Constitutional), France]
4 Feb 179848.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Gironde (Constitutional), France]
Aug 1801³52.0ResignedBishop of [Gironde (Constitutional), France]
9 Apr 180252.7SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
30 Apr 180252.7ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
20 Jun 180252.9InstalledBishop of Angoulême, France
7 Apr 182373.7DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique Lacombe (VIAF: 39486770)
Bishop Dominique Lacombe (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréjeau
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceAngoulême, Diocese of Angoulême

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 187
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast