Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Bécherel

Deceased

Bishop of Valence, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1732Born
22 Feb 179158.9SelectedBishop of [Manche (Constitutional), France]
20 Mar 179159.0Ordained BishopBishop of [Manche (Constitutional), France]
5 Jul 180270.3SelectedBishop of Valence, France
15 Jul 180270.3ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
23 Jul 180270.3InstalledBishop of Valence, France
25 Jun 181583.2DiedBishop of Valence, France

MicroData Summary for François Bécherel (VIAF: 2581197)
Bishop François Bécherel (born , died ) Bishop of Valence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Hilaire-du-Harcôuët
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceValence, Diocese of Valence

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast