Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean Baptiste Aubry] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Meuse (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1736Born
21 Feb 179154.8SelectedBishop of [Meuse (Constitutional), France]
13 Mar 179154.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Meuse (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³65.4ResignedBishop of [Meuse (Constitutional), France]
1 Jun 181377.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Meuse (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste Aubry (VIAF: 73063919)
Bishop Jean Baptiste Aubry (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meuse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Aubin sur Aire
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceCommercy

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast