Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Joseph Monin], O. Praem. †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Ardennes (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1741Born
5 Sep 176220.7ProfessedMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
3 Mar 179856.2SelectedBishop of [Ardennes (Constitutional), France]
1 Jul 179856.6Ordained BishopBishop of [Ardennes (Constitutional), France]
1801²59.1ResignedBishop of [Ardennes (Constitutional), France]
19 Jan 182987.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Ardennes (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Monin (VIAF: 121569509)
Bishop Joseph Monin O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ardennes

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaliseul, Belgium
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceMetz

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast