Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Nicolas Jacquemin], C.S.Sp. †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Cayenne (Constitutional), Antilles]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1737Born
13 Mar 178750.1AppointedPrefect of French Guiana-Cayenne, Antilles
2 Jun 179154.3ResignedPrefect of French Guiana-Cayenne, Antilles
2 Jun 179154.3AppointedPrefect of French Guiana-Cayenne, Antilles
1798¹60.9SelectedBishop of [Cayenne (Constitutional), Antilles]
4 Feb 179861.0Ordained BishopBishop of [Cayenne (Constitutional), Antilles]
23 Oct 180164.7ResignedBishop of [Cayenne (Constitutional), Antilles]
3 Apr 181679.2DiedBishop Emeritus of [Cayenne (Constitutional), Antilles]

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Jacquemin (VIAF: 47143184)
Bishop Nicolas Jacquemin C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cayenne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsnes
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceLa Tombe, Diocese of Meaux, France

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1798, Number 1
  • b: CB, 24 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Sep 2021

Quantcast