Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Louis-Charles Bisson] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1742Born
1799²56.2SelectedBishop of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]
6 Oct 179956.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³58.9ResignedBishop of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]
28 Feb 182077.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles Bisson (VIAF: 5602153126239724750004)
Bishop Louis-Charles Bisson (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calvados

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeffosses
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBayeux

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast