Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Isaac-Étienne Robinet] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Charente-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1731Born
1 Mar 179159.2SelectedBishop of [Charente-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
20 Mar 179159.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Charente-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
6 Dec 179362.0ResignedBishop of [Charente-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
8 Sep 179765.8DiedBishop Emeritus of [Charente-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Isaac-Étienne Robinet (VIAF: 188478058)
Bishop Isaac-Étienne Robinet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Charente-Inférieure

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Jean-d'Angély
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceTorxé

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast