Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manolo Alarcon de los Santos

Bishop of Virac, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1947 Born
7 May 197426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
12 Aug 199447.0AppointedBishop of Virac, Philippines
12 Sep 199447.1Ordained BishopBishop of Virac, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Manolo Alarcon de los Santos
Bishop Manolo Alarcon de los Santos (born ) Bishop of Virac

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBasud

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Virac.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,436
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast