Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lucena

Dioecesis Lucenensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Emilio Z. Marquez, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 28 March 1950
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lipa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 2,334 (901 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 60, 4301 Lucena City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (042)710.45.85; 373.16.46
  • Fax: 710.47.28

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 March 1950ErectedDiocese of Lipa Diocese of Lucena (erected)
2 April 1977Territory LostDiocese of Lucena Diocese of Boac (erected)
9 April 1984Territory LostDiocese of Lucena Diocese of Gumaca (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950500,000502,50099.5%444411,36333ap1951
1970941,847.0%9292020758ap1971
1980923,175982,10194.0%909010,25716149ap1981
1990646,643673,00096.1%535312,20018731ap1991
1999818,425889,56292.0%7817910,359118531ap2000
2000832,007948,63387.7%7617710,805131131ap2001
2001780,875867,63990.0%7617710,141116932ap2002
2002795,364893,66889.0%10711087,3641019632ap2003
2003809,282920,47887.9%842869,410220632ap2004
2004834,322948,09388.0%912938,971516132ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 May 2014