Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Fleury

Deceased

Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1884BornLe Val-Saint-Germain
29 Jun 191631.5Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
24 Dec 193450.0AppointedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
11 Feb 193550.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
16 Aug 194964.6DiedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France

MicroData Summary for Marcel Fleury:
Bishop Marcel Fleury (born , died ) Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013