Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Guiller

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)

Titular Bishop of Antiochia ad Maeandrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1901BornCampbon
27 Jul 192826.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 194745.9AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
27 Nov 194746.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
10 Apr 196159.4ResignedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
10 Apr 196159.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiochia ad Maeandrum
10 Jun 196361.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France

MicroData Summary for Félix Guiller:
Bishop Félix Guiller (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013