Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stéphane-Émile-Alfred Desmazières

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1903BornLille
11 Jun 192724.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 196057.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
23 Jun 196057.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
14 Sep 196057.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
2 Aug 196562.2AppointedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
20 Sep 197875.3RetiredBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
13 Nov 199996.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Stéphane-Émile-Alfred Desmazières:
Bishop Stéphane-Émile-Alfred Desmazières (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

  • a priest for 72.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 91
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013