Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph James Byrne, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moshi

Titular Bishop of Abaradira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1880BornClonmel, Ireland
19 Dec 190323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
29 Nov 193252.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro, Tanzania
29 Nov 193252.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vasada
20 Mar 193352.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vasada
25 Mar 195372.9AppointedBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
15 May 195979.1RetiredBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
15 May 195979.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abaradira
20 Oct 196181.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Moshi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Joseph James Byrne:
Bishop Joseph James Byrne C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moshi

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013