Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmond John Fitzmaurice

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

Titular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1881Born
28 May 190422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jul 192544.0AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
30 Nov 192544.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
1 Mar 196078.6RetiredBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
1 Mar 196078.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia
25 Jul 196281.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for Edmond John Fitzmaurice
Archbishop Edmond John Fitzmaurice (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarbert, Ireland

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Feb 2018