Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vittorio Amedeo Cardinal Ranuzzi de’ Bianchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Recanati e Loreto

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1857BornBologna
13 Mar 188022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
22 Jun 190345.9AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
12 Jul 190346.0Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
27 Nov 191154.4ResignedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
27 Nov 191154.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
4 Dec 191659.4Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 191659.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
16 Feb 192769.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Amedeo Ranuzzi de’ Bianchi:
Vittorio Amedeo Cardinal Ranuzzi de’ Bianchi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Recanati e Loreto

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 478
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 32
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014