Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roko Franjo Vučić

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1850Born
20 May 187423.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 190757.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
22 Sep 190757.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
24 May 191059.7AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
2 Jul 191463.8DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Roko Franjo Vučić
Bishop Roko Franjo Vučić (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto Re (Kraljevica)

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast