Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis O’Hern

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1874Born
17 Feb 190126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
4 Jan 192954.5AppointedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
19 Mar 192954.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
22 May 193358.9DiedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis O’Hern
Bishop John Francis O’Hern (born , died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlean, NY

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: CB, 30 Nov 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018