Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donald Mackintosh

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1877Born
1 Nov 190023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Feb 192244.3AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
21 May 192244.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Dec 194366.1DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Donald Mackintosh (VIAF: 300325562)
Archbishop Donald Mackintosh (born , died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlasnacardoch, Mallaig, Inverness-shire, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, Bearsden, Glasgow, Dunbartonshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter, Cemetery, Dalbeth, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 23
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast