Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Fratocchi

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1855BornRoma
22 May 188024.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Oct 188024.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 190347.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orvieto, Italy
22 Jun 190347.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
28 Jun 190347.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
24 Jan 190549.3AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
6 Dec 194186.1DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Fratocchi:
Bishop Salvatore Fratocchi (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 380
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1903, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013