Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Santi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montefeltro

Titular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1863BornBologna
4 Jun 188723.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 191248.3AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
15 Aug 191248.6Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
15 Jun 194076.4RetiredBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
15 Jun 194076.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
28 Jan 194480.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Santi:
Archbishop Raffaele Santi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montefeltro

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015