Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Prospero Scaccia

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1857BornCittÓ della Pieve
22 Jun 190346.1AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
29 Jun 190346.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
5 Jun 190952.1AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
5 Dec 190952.6InstalledArchbishop of Siena, Italy
29 Sep 193275.4DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Prospero Scaccia:
Archbishop Prospero Scaccia (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Feb 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 553
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1903, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013