Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Joseph Curley

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore-Washington, Maryland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1879BornAthlone, Ireland
19 Mar 190424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
3 Apr 191434.5AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
30 Jun 191434.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
10 Aug 192141.8AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
30 Nov 192142.1InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
12 Dec 192445.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
1 Jul 192545.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
16 May 194767.6DiedArchbishop of Baltimore-Washington, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Curley:
Archbishop Michael Joseph Curley (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore-Washington

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 39
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 73, and Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013