Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Pulisic

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1853BornUlbo
5 Dec 187522.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 190350.8AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
31 Jan 190451.0Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
16 Jun 191057.4AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
2 Apr 192269.2ResignedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
2 Apr 192269.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
6 Feb 193683.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vincent Pulisic:
Archbishop Vincent Pulisic (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013