Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Pothacamury (Pothakamuri)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore, India

Titular Archbishop of Thimida Regia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1889Born
17 Dec 191627.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 194050.6AppointedBishop of Guntur, India
29 Jun 194050.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guntur, India
15 Oct 194253.1AppointedBishop of Bangalore, India
19 Sep 195364.0AppointedArchbishop of Bangalore, India
11 Jan 196878.3RetiredArchbishop of Bangalore, India
11 Jan 196878.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thimida Regia
18 May 196878.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Pothacamury (Pothakamuri)
Archbishop Thomas Pothacamury (Pothakamuri) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavipadu
Ordained BishopMadras, Archdiocese of Madras

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1940, Number 39
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 97, Number 8,319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast